Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. POSTAL SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01535
Date Filed2020-06-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted five FOIA requests to U.S. Postal Service for records on a variety of topics. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of the requests, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. POSTAL SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-111COMPLAINT against U.S. POSTAL SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7219197) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-11Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/17/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/17/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/17/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. POSTAL SERVICE served on 6/17/2020 (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar