Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleROBBINS GELLER RUDMAN & DOWD LLP v. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01537
Date Filed2020-06-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffROBBINS GELLER RUDMAN & DOWD LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd submitted a FOIA request to the Securities and Exchange Commission for records concerning the agency's investigations of OvaScience, a fertility company. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. It then denied the request under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Robbins Geller filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal. The agency denied the appeal. Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-111COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7219687) filed by ROBBINS GELLER RUDMAN & DOWD LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Astley, Stephen) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-12Case assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmc) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-122SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-183COMPLAINT - CORRECTED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by ROBBINS GELLER RUDMAN & DOWD LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Astley, Stephen) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-234RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION served on 6/15/2020 (Astley, Stephen) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar