Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01538
Date Filed2020-06-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning Attorney General William Barr's meetings and communications. The agency acknowledged receipt of the three requests. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, American Oversight file suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-111COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7220113) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-12Case assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmc) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-124MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Megan Field, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7224130. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-15MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Megan Catherine Field is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/15/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-06-175NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Field on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Field, Megan) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/22/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/22/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/22/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/22/2020 (Field, Megan) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar