Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAl Otro Lado et al v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2020cv05191
Date Filed2020-06-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Otis D. Wright, II
PlaintiffAl Otro Lado
PlaintiffEdwin F. Mandel Legal Aid Clinic
Case DescriptionAl Ostro Lado, a legal aid clinic serving refugees, migrants, and deportees in the U.S. and Mexico, and the Edwin F. Mandel Legal Aid Clinic, a legal clinic at the University of Chicago specializing in immigration issues, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the outbreak of COVID-19 at detention centers. They also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the request for expedited processing. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, the legal clinics filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantImmigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantCustoms and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-111COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26771530 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Erika D Pinheiro added to party Al Otro Lado(pty:pla))(Pinheiro, Erika) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-112NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Attorney Erika D Pinheiro added to party Edwin F. Mandel Legal Aid Clinic(pty:pla))(Pinheiro, Erika) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-113CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Edwin F. Mandel Legal Aid Clinic. (Pinheiro, Erika) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-114Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Edwin F. Mandel Legal Aid Clinic. (Pinheiro, Erika) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-115NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Edwin F. Mandel Legal Aid Clinic. Related Case(s): 5:20-cv-00768-TJH-PVC (Pinheiro, Erika) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-116(STRICKEN PER 6/16/20 ORDER DOCKET NO. 14)First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney A. Nicole Hallett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Edwin F. Mandel Legal Aid Clinic (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26771993) filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Edwin F. Mandel Legal Aid Clinic. (Pinheiro, Erika) Modified on 6/16/2020 (lc). (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-117NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney A. Nicole Hallett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Edwin F. Mandel Legal Aid Clinic (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26771993) 6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-118(STRICKEN PER 6/16/20 ORDER DOCKET NO. 14)First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney A. Nicole Hallett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Edwin F. Mandel Legal Aid Clinic (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 6/11/2020, Receipt No. 26771993) filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Edwin F. Mandel Legal Aid Clinic. (Pinheiro, Erika) Modified on 6/16/2020 (lc). (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-119NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-1110NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-111160 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Customs and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security, and Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (jtil) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-1212MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-1213First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney A. Nicole Hallett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Edwin F. Mandel Legal Aid Clinic (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 6/11/2020, Receipt No. 26771993) filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Edwin F. Mandel Legal Aid Clinic. (Pinheiro, Erika) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-1614ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney A. Nicole Hallett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Edwin F. Mandel Legal Aid Clinic (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26771993) 6 , First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney A. Nicole Hallett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Edwin F. Mandel Legal Aid Clinic (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 6/11/2020, Receipt No. 26771993) 8 , for the following reasons: Comply with instructions on discrepancy doc no.7 (re: 6). and re: doc no. 8, party filed another application for the same relief at 13 . (lc) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-1615ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney A. Nicole Hallett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado and designating Erika D. Pinheiro as local counsel 13 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc) Modified on 6/16/2020 (lc). (Entered: 06/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar