Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOHIO VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL COALITION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01554
Date Filed2020-06-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffOHIO VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL COALITION
Case DescriptionThe Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Energy for records concerning the agency's support of PTT Global Chemical America 's planned Belmont County, Ohio petrochemical facility. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told the Coalition that its search had located 650 potentially responsive records but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-121COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7224879) filed by OHIO VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL COALITION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K)(Van Dalen, Corinne) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-122MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Megan M. Hunter, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7225013. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OHIO VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL COALITION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Megan M. Hunter, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Dalen, Corinne) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-123MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Victoria Bogdan Tejeda, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7225043. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OHIO VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL COALITION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Victoria Bogdan Tejeda, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Dalen, Corinne) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-124LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by OHIO VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL COALITION (Van Dalen, Corinne) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-15Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, ) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-06-155SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-06-166STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 16, 2020. (lcbah4) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-17MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING 2 Motion of Megan Hunter to Appear and Participate Pro Hac Vice and 3 Motion of Victoria Bogdan Tejeda to Appear and Participate Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Megan Hunter and Victoria Bogdan Tejeda may enter appearances for the purpose of representing plaintiff Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 17, 2020. (ztnr) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-267NOTICE of Appearance by Megan M. Hunter on behalf of OHIO VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL COALITION (Hunter, Megan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-268NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Bogdan Tejeda on behalf of OHIO VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL COALITION (Bogdan Tejeda, Victoria) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-299RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 6/22/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Proof of Service Return Receipt)(Van Dalen, Corinne) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-2910RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 6/22/2020. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 7/13/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Proof of Service Return Receipt)(Van Dalen, Corinne) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-2911RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/22/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/22/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Proof of Service Return Receipt)(Van Dalen, Corinne) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar