Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Transparency Project v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictEastern District of Texas
CitySherman
Case Number4:2020cv00468
Date Filed2020-06-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III
PlaintiffThe Transparency Project
Case DescriptionThe Transparency Project submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning investigations of potential or alleged misconduct by judges. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked for clarification. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Transparency Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-121COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7837189.), filed by The Transparency Project. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (FOIA request letter), # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clevenger, Ty) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/15/2020) (rpc, ). (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-12Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-12In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rpc, ) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-152Summons Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es))(rpc, ) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar