Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHua v. Eggleston et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2020cv00889
Date Filed2020-06-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge J Richard Creatura
PlaintiffRalph Hua
DefendantJill A Eggleston Director of Freedom of Information Act Operations of the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantKen Cuccinelli Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director (vacant) of the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantChad F Wolf Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-061COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Summons(es) to be issued) (Receipt # SEA100942), filed by Ralph Hua. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons AG, # 4 Summons AUSA, # 5 Summons DHS, # 6 Summons Eggleston, # 7 Summons USCIS, # 8 Email transmittal)(CDA) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-062DECLARATION re 1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Ralph Hua (CDA) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-103Summons(es) Issued as to All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(CDA)(mailed to plaintiff via US Mail) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-104LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-245NOTICE: Plaintiff Ralph Hua has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-286AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to All defendants on 6/12/2020, filed by Plaintiff Ralph Hua. (Hua, Ralph) (Entered: 06/28/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar