Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01583
Date Filed2020-06-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Customs and Border Protection and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning progress on reuniting minors detained at the border with their families. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOM ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-161COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOM ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7236037) filed by ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons to US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, # 6 Summons to US Customs and Border Protection, # 7 Summons to Acting US Attorney for DC, # 8 Summons to US Attorney General)(Stern, Robert) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-162MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rene Kathawala, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7236114. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rene Kathawala, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rowe, Tiffany) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-17Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, ) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-173ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOM ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) Modified on 6/18/2020 (adh, ). (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-184STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 06/18/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-185Case randomly reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-186REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint,, filed by ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Stern, Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-187Case randomly reassigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Judge Amy Berman Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-238GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/23/2020. (jag) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-23MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Rene Kathawala is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/23/2020. (jag) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-259NOTICE of Appearance by Rene Kathawala on behalf of ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP (Kathawala, Rene) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-2510CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP re 8 Order,, Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, . (Rowe, Tiffany) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar