Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP v. DEFENSE CONTRACT MANAGEMENT AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01584
Date Filed2020-06-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Willkie Farr & Gallagher, which represents individuals who were killed or injured by Taliban terrorists in Afghanistan, submitted nine FOIA requests to the Defense Contract Management Agency for records concerning various contracts awarded during the war in Afghanistan. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEFENSE CONTRACT MANAGEMENT AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-161COMPLAINT against DEFENSE CONTRACT MANAGEMENT AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7236184) filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 01 - FOIA Request, # 6 Exhibit 02 - FOIA Request, # 7 Exhibit 03 - FOIA Request, # 8 Exhibit 04 - FOIA Request, # 9 Exhibit 05 - FOIA Request, # 10 Exhibit 06 - FOIA Request, # 11 Exhibit 07 - FOIA Request, # 12 Exhibit 08 - Follow up to Previously Submitted FOIA Requests, # 13 Exhibit 09 - RE_ Non-DoD Source Subsequent Follow Up, # 14 Exhibit 10 - FOIA Request, # 15 Exhibit 11 - FOIA Request)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-173ERRATA by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP 1 Complaint,, filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Complaint)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-18Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-184SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEFENSE CONTRACT MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar