Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP v. DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01585
Date Filed2020-06-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Willkie Farr & Gallagher submitted FOIA requests to the Drug Enforcement Administration for records concerning the agency's operations in Afghanistan and contracts it awarded. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-161COMPLAINT against DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7236308) filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 01 - FOIA Request., # 6 Exhibit 02 - FOIA Request, # 7 Exhibit 03 - FOIA Request, # 8 Exhibit 04 - FW_ FOIA Request)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-173ERRATA by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP 1 Complaint, filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Complaint)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-18Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-184SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-185GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/18/2020. (jag) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar