Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP v. DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01586
Date Filed2020-06-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Willkie Farr & Gallagher submitted a FOIA request to the Defense Intelligence Agency for records concerning the New Ansari file. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-161COMPLAINT against DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7236324) filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 01 - FOIA Request)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-173ERRATA by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP 1 Complaint, filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Complaint)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-18Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-184SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar