Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP v. OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF DEFENSE AND THE JOINT STAFF
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01587
Date Filed2020-06-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Willkie Farr & Gallagher submitted FOIA requests to the Office of the Secretary of Defense for records concerning counter threat finance activities and audit reports. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF DEFENSE AND THE JOINT STAFF
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-161COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF DEFENSE AND THE JOINT STAFF ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7236393) filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 01 - FOIA Request, # 6 Exhibit 02 - FOIA Request, # 7 Exhibit 03 - Follow up to Previously Submitted FOIA Requests, # 8 Exhibit 04 - FOIA Request, # 9 Exhibit 05 - RE FOIA Request, # 10 Exhibit 06 - Freedom of Information Act 20-F-1144 Interim Response)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-173ERRATA by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP 1 Complaint,, filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Complaint)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-18Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (adh, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-184SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF DEFENSE AND THE JOINT STAFF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar