Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP v. SPECIAL INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR AFGHANISTAN RECONSTRUCTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01588
Date Filed2020-06-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Willkie Farr & Gallagher submitted FOIA requests to the Special Inspector General for Afghanistan Reconstruction for records concerning audits and reports and corruption in conflict. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantSPECIAL INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR AFGHANISTAN RECONSTRUCTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-161COMPLAINT against SPECIAL INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR AFGHANISTAN RECONSTRUCTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7236772) filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 01 - FOIA Request, # 6 Exhibit 02 -FOIA Request 2020-F-01, # 7 Exhibit 03 - FOIA Request, # 8 Exhibit 04 - Extension FOIA requests 2020-F-011 2020-F-012 2020-F-013, # 9 Exhibit 05 - FOIA Request 2020-F-012, # 10 Exhibit 06 - FOIA Request, # 11 Exhibit 07 - FOIA Request 2020-F-013 Denial, # 12 Exhibit 08 - FOIA Request 2020-F-012, # 13 Exhibit 09 - FOIA Request 2020-F-013, # 14 Exhibit 10 - SIGAR Appeal - 2020-F-011, 2020-F-012, 2020-F-013)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-22Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, ) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SPECIAL INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR AFGHANISTAN RECONSTRUCTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-224STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/22/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar