Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMarc Cohodes v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2020cv04015
Date Filed2020-06-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
PlaintiffMarc Cohodes Plaintiff
Case DescriptionMarc Cohodes submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice, the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys, and the FBI for records concerning communications with Sen. Johnny Isakson (R-GA) pertaining to attempts to silence Cohodes and Parker Petit's criticism of the company MiMedx. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request. Only the FBI provided 12 pages of records redacted under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Cohodes then submitted three more FOIA requests to the agencies. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Cohodes filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantExecutive Office for United States Attorneys
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-171COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violations of the Freedom of Information Act against All Defendants (no process) ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14589387.). Filed by Marc Cohodes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shapiro, David) (Filed on 6/17/2020) Modified on 6/18/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-172Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-183Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-234MOTION to Relate Case filed by Marc Cohodes. (Norton, William) (Filed on 6/23/2020) Modified on 6/23/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-235Proposed Summons. (Norton, William) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-236Proposed Summons. (Norton, William) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-237Proposed Summons. (Norton, William) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-23Electronic filing error . Document filed in wrong case. [err401]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: 7 Proposed Summons filed by Marc Cohodes, 5 Propos ed Summons filed by Marc Cohodes, 6 Proposed Summons filed by Marc Cohodes, 4 MOTION to Relate Case PLAINTIFF MARC COHODESS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Marc Cohodes (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-238Proposed Summons. (Norton, William) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-239Proposed Summons. (Norton, William) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-2310Proposed Summons. (Norton, William) (Filed on 6/23/2020) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-2411Summons Issued as to Executive Office for United States Attorneys, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-2512CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc Cohodes re 1 Complaint, Summons, Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines, DMR Standing Order (Turetzky, Matthew) (Filed on 6/25/2020) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar