Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleASSOCIATED MORTGAGE BANKERS, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01601
Date Filed2020-06-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffASSOCIATED MORTGAGE BANKERS, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Associated Mortgage Bankers submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Housing and Urban Development. The first request asked for records concerning how current administrative judges at the agency were appointed. The second request asked for all agency final opinions in adjudication cases. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Associated Mortgage Bankers filed suit.
Complaint issues: Affirmative disclosure, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7240190) filed by ASSOCIATED MORTGAGE BANKERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons HUD, # 5 Summons US ATTY, # 6 Summons ATTY GEN.)(Souders, David) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-172NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ASSOCIATED MORTGAGE BANKERS, INC.. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-0075. (Souders, David) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-18Case assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (zmc) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-194Case randomly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Ellen S. Huvelle is no longer assigned to the case as deemed not related. (ztnr) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-195STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 19, 2020. (lccjn1) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-226NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Michael Serafin on behalf of ASSOCIATED MORTGAGE BANKERS, INC. (Serafin, Brian) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar