Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01610
Date Filed2020-06-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the agency's response to the corona virus pandemic. After hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7244018) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to USAO, # 3 Summons as to AG, # 4 Summons as to DHS, # 5 Summons as to ICE)(Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-182LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-19Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-193SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-07-294ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Chang, William) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-07-29MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by August 12, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 07/29/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-07-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/12/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-08-075RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/29/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/29/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/30/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 6/26/2020; U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 6/26/2020 (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 08/07/2020)
2020-08-126PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Shaw, Khahilia); Modified event and text on 8/12/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-12NOTICE OF ERROR re 6 Status Report; emailed to khahilia.shaw@americanoversight.org, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please do not refile. The correction has been made. (ztth, ) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-12MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 6 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by September 24, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/12/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/24/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-09-237Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Chang, William) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-23MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 7 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by October 26, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/23/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/26/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-10-238Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-10-26MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 8 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by December 2, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/26/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-11-019NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney William Chang (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 11/01/2020)
2020-12-0210Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 10 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by January 8, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/02/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/8/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2021-01-0511Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 01/05/2021)
2021-01-06MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 11 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by February 19, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 01/06/2021. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/19/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar