Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01625
Date Filed2020-06-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted a FOIA request to the Food and Safety Inspection Service for records concerning notification by FSIS of market hog establishments of the agency's intent to use a new swine inspection system. Public Citizen also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency located seven responsive pages but withheld them under Exemption 4 (confidential business information). Public Citizen filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Citizen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-191COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7249612) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-223ERRATA Civil Cover Sheet by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-22Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-224SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-235GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/23/2020. (jag) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar