Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInternational Refugee Assistance Project, Inc. v. United States Department of State
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv04728
Date Filed2020-06-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge J. Paul Oetken
PlaintiffInternational Refugee Assistance Project, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe International Refugee Assistance Project submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning the Chief of Mission process for processing Special Immigrant Visas. IRAP also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests. The agency denied IRAP's request for expedited processing. The agency also disclosed 34 pages in response to IRAP's first request but withheld records under Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). IRAP filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of IRAP's administrative appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, IRAP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-191COMPLAINT against United States Department of State. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20339707)Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - May 23, 2017 FOIA Request to State Department, # 2 Exhibit B - December 13, 2019 FOIA Request to State Department).(Christensen, Evert) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-192CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Christensen, Evert) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-193REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Christensen, Evert) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-194NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Victor Sean Leung on behalf of International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc..(Leung, Victor) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-22CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(jgo) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-22Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (jgo) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-22Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-225ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of State..(jgo) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar