Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGRECO v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01595
Date Filed2020-06-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffRICHARD A. GRECO
Case DescriptionRichard Greco, an attorney representing GBX Group, submitted eight FOIA requests to the IRS for records concerning the examination file for the agency's audit of GBX Group. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Greco filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-171COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7239658), CIVIL COVER SHEET by Richard A Greco, REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by Richard A Greco. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Declaration, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit)(Clarke, George) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-18Case assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmc) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-182SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-253STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 06/25/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 6/26/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Confirmation of Delivery)(Clarke, George) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/26/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Confirmation of Delivery)(Clarke, George) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/23/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/23/2020. (Clarke, George) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar