Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHALL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01631
Date Filed2020-06-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffFRANKIE D. HALL
Case DescriptionFrankie Hall submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Air Force for records concerning qualifications of board members of the Physical Disability Board of Review and their voting sheets. The agency disclosed heavily redacted records pertaining to board member qualifications and their voting sheets. Hall filed administrative appeals for both responses but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Hall filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-221COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7253420) filed by FRANKIE D. HALL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Summons Attorney General, # 5 Summons Air Force, # 6 Summons US Attorney, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet JS44, # 8 Supplement Related Case Form, # 9 Supplement Magistrate Consent)(Manne, Jason) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-222NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FRANKIE D. HALL. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-2354. (zmc) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-233ERRATA (Corrected complaint with defendant's address and corrected magistrate consent form) by FRANKIE D. HALL 1 Complaint, filed by FRANKIE D. HALL. (Attachments: # 1 Errata)(Manne, Jason) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-24Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zsb) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-254SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-07-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. United States Department of the Air Force served on 7/2/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/02/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/2/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/1/2020.) (Manne, Jason) Modified on 7/14/2020 to correct party served (zjf). (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-166STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/16/2020. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-307ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar