Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLawrence v. United States Small Business Administration
DistrictEastern District of Michigan
CityDetroit
Case Number2:2020cv11637
Date Filed2020-06-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Mark A. Goldsmith
PlaintiffFrank J. Lawrence, Jr.
Case DescriptionFrank Lawrence submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Small Business Administration for records concerning whether three local companies requested and received aid under the paycheck protection program. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Lawrence that it was taking a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Lawrence filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Small Business Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-221COMPLAINT filed by Frank J. Lawrence, Jr against United States Small Business Association. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Filing Fee Paid $400-Receipt #AMIEDC-7878824 County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: USA - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 (SBA's FOIA Response Letter)) (Dubuc, Dennis) Modified on 6/23/2020 (SKra). (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-222[ENTERED IN ERROR] Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 6/29/2020 (SKra) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-22A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-233SUMMONS Issued for *United States Small Business Administration* (SKra) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-234SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (SKra) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-07-025ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-276AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Frank J. Lawrence, Jr against Frank J. Lawrence, Jr. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 (SBA Response Letter), # 3 Exhibit 2 (PPP Application Form)) (Dubuc, Dennis) Modified on 7/27/2020 (DWor). [DOCUMENT FILED AGAINST DEFENDANT] (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-07-307STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar