Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCruz v. Executive Office of United States Attorneys
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityEugene
Case Number6:2020cv00995
Date Filed2020-06-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai
PlaintiffShannon Cruz an individual
Case DescriptionShannon Cruz submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records concerning USA v. Willamette Valley Toxicology. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Cruz filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantExecutive Office of United States Attorneys a department of the United States Executive Branch
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-221Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6869589 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Shannon Cruz against United States Attorney (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons). (Lay-Perez, Joshua) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-232Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 10/21/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/20/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 11/20/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jw) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-233Summons Issued Electronically as to Executive Office of United States Attorneys. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-07-274Answer to 1 Complaint, . Filed by Executive Office of United States Attorneys. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-07-285Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Rule 16 Conference is set for 8/4/2020 at 10:30AM in Eugene by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The parties are ordered to call into the Court's conference line at least 5 minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. Call-in information will be sent by separate order. Please use a land line connection without external noise. The Court prohibits speaker phones due to the greatly diminished sound quality. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, consent to a magistrate judge, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order issued by the court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. The parties and counsel are encouraged to advise the Court of their preferred pronouns. People appearing before this Court may do so in writing and when appearing for conferences, hearings or trials. Attorneys are encouraged to identify their preferred pronouns in their signature lines when submitting documents for filing. All parties and counsel are instructed to address each other in all written documents and court proceedings by those pronouns previously identified. (jk) (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-08-036Unopposed Motion for Leave for Certified Law Student Appearance . Filed by Shannon Cruz. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration) (Lay-Perez, Joshua) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar