Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01694
Date Filed2020-06-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted FOIA requests to OMB, Department of Health and Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, and Department of Treasury for records concerning communications between senior officials and a number of conservative media organizations. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-231COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7257962) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons)(Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-23Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-233SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-234STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/23/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-255NOTICE of Appearance by Sean A. Lev on behalf of DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Lev, Sean) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-256NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Seel on behalf of DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Seel, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-07-087RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 7/2/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 6/29/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 6/29/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 6/29/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/29/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/29/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/29/2020.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-108NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of All Defendants (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-209NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Alan Burch (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-2210NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. Attorney Nitin Shah terminated. (Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-2311Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-23MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint on or before August 28, 2020. Defendants shall also separately file, on or before August 28, 2020, a Status Report describing the procedural posture of Plaintiff's FOIA requests. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/23/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Complaint due by 8/28/2020. Defendants' Status Report due by 8/28/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar