Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2020-06-23 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES COAST GUARD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7260115) filed by MARY ANNE CAMPO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Coast Guard, # 3 Summons USAG, # 4 Summons USAO)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 06/23/2020) |
2020-06-23 | 2 | ERRATA CORRECTED COMPLAINT by MARY ANNE CAMPO 1 Complaint, filed by MARY ANNE CAMPO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Complaint)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 06/23/2020) |
2020-06-24 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 06/24/2020) |
2020-06-25 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/25/2020) |
2020-08-05 | 4 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD.(Truong, John) (Entered: 08/05/2020) |
2020-08-06 | 5 | ORDER. The parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before August 20, 2020. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/6/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/06/2020) |
2020-08-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/20/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 08/06/2020) |
2020-08-20 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Truong, John) (Entered: 08/20/2020) |
2020-08-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by October 1, 2020, which addresses the five issues set forth in the court's Order of August 6, 2020, ECF No. 5. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/21/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/21/2020) |
2020-08-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 08/24/2020) |
2020-09-10 | 7 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joseph F. Carilli, Jr on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney John Cuong Truong (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2020) |
2020-10-01 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 10/01/2020) |
2020-10-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. The court agrees that setting a summary judgment briefing schedule would be premature at this point, before Plaintiff has reviewed information related to the search performed by Defendant. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by November 16, 2020, which advises whether any unresolved disputes remain and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/2/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 10/02/2020) |
2020-10-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 10/02/2020) |
2020-11-16 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 11/16/2020) |
2020-11-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by February 3, 2021, that advises whether any unresolved disputes remain and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/17/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/17/2020) |
2020-11-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/3/2021. (zjd) (Entered: 11/19/2020) |
2021-02-03 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 02/03/2021) |
2021-02-04 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by April 2, 2021, that advises whether any unresolved disputes remain and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/4/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 02/04/2021) |
2021-03-31 | 11 | MOTION to Consolidate Cases by JOHN CAMPO, MARY ANNE CAMPO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit Doss Decl, # 4 Exhibit NARA Complaint, # 5 Exhibit Related Case Form)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 03/31/2021) |
2021-04-02 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 04/02/2021) |
2021-04-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by June 2, 2021, that advises whether any unresolved disputes remain and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/2/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 04/02/2021) |
2021-04-14 | 13 | Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 04/14/2021) |
2021-05-23 | | MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate without prejudice. Due to the differing procedural posture of the subject cases, consolidation of the instant matter (Campo I) with Campo v. U.S. National Archives & Records Administration, Case No. 21-cv-871 (APM) (D.D.C.) (Campo II) is not warranted. See Hanson v. District of Columbia, 257 F.R.D. 19, 21 (D.D.C. 2009) ("If the parties at issue, the procedural posture and the allegations in each case are different... consolidation is not appropriate." (citing Stewart v. O'Neill, 225 F. Supp. 2d 16, 21 (D.D.C. 2002))). Campo I is well down the road of searches and production of records, see Joint Status Report, ECF No. 12, whereas Campo II is in its infancy, with a motion to dismiss only recently becoming ripe, see Campo II, Def.'s Reply Mem. in Supp. of Def.'s Mot. to Dismiss, ECF No. 7 (filed May 20, 2021). Accordingly, the objectives of judicial economy and efficiency that otherwise might justify consolidation are absent at the present time. Plaintiffs' motion is therefore denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/23/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/23/2021) |
2021-06-02 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 06/02/2021) |
2021-06-03 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by August 2, 2021, that advises whether any unresolved disputes remain and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/3/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 06/03/2021) |
2021-06-22 | 15 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/6/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/5/2020. (Sorenson, C.) (Main Document 15 replaced on 6/28/2021) (zeg). (Entered: 06/22/2021) |
2021-06-22 | 16 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/6/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES COAST GUARD served on 7/2/2020 (eg). (See Docket Entry 15 to view document). (Entered: 06/28/2021) |
2021-08-02 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 08/02/2021) |
2021-08-03 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by November 4, 2021, that advises whether any unresolved disputes remain and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/3/2021. (lcapm2) (Entered: 08/03/2021) |
2021-11-04 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 11/04/2021) |
2021-11-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by December 7, 2021, which updates the court on Defendant's search for, processing, and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/8/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/08/2021) |
2021-12-07 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/07/2021) |
2021-12-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by January 18, 2022, which updates the court on Defendant's search for, processing, and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/08/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 12/08/2021) |
2021-12-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/18/2022. (mac) (Entered: 12/09/2021) |
2021-12-21 | 20 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of UNITED STATES COAST GUARD Substituting for attorney Joseph F. Carilli, Jr. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/21/2021) |
2021-12-25 | 21 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Bradley Silverman on behalf of UNITED STATES COAST GUARD Substituting for attorney Benton G. Peterson (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 12/25/2021) |
2022-01-18 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 01/18/2022) |
2022-01-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by March 21, 2022, which updates the court on Defendant's search for, processing, and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/19/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/19/2022) |
2022-03-21 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 03/21/2022) |
2022-03-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by May 31, 2022, which updates the court on Defendant's search for, processing, and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/22/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 03/22/2022) |
2022-05-31 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 05/31/2022) |
2022-05-31 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by July 25, 2022, which updates the court on Defendant's search for, processing, and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/31/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/31/2022) |
2022-07-25 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 07/25/2022) |
2022-07-26 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by October 5, 2022, which updates the court on Defendant's search for, processing, and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/26/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 07/26/2022) |
2022-10-05 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 10/05/2022) |
2022-10-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by October 21, 2022, which proposes a schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/6/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 10/06/2022) |
2022-10-21 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 10/21/2022) |
2022-10-24 | 28 | ORDER. The court orders the following with regard to further proceedings in this matter: (1) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before December 14, 2022; (2) Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before January 4, 2023; (3) Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before January 18, 2023; and (4) Plaintiffs' Reply shall be filed on or before February 1, 2023. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/24/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 10/24/2022) |
2022-12-14 | 29 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 12/14/2022) |
2022-12-15 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Briefing Deadlines. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before February 1, 2023. Plaintiff's Response and Cross-Motion shall be due on or before March 1, 2023. Defendant's Reply and Cross-Response shall be due on or before April 1, 2023. Plaintiff's Cross-Reply shall be due on or before May 1, 2023. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/15/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 12/15/2022) |
2023-01-12 | 30 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joshua Ontell on behalf of UNITED STATES COAST GUARD Substituting for attorney Bradley Silverman (Ontell, Joshua) (Entered: 01/12/2023) |
2023-01-31 | 31 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Briefing by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Ontell, Joshua) (Entered: 01/31/2023) |
2023-02-01 | 32 | ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time. The Scheduling Order is modified as follows: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before May 4, 2023; Plaintiffs Response and Cross-Motion shall be filed on or before June 8, 2023; Defendant's Reply and Cross-Response shall be filed on or before July 13, 2023; Plaintiff's Cross-Reply shall be filed on or before August 11, 2023. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/31/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 02/01/2023) |
2023-03-23 | 33 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by M. Jared Littman on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Joshua Ontell (Littman, M. Jared) (Entered: 03/23/2023) |
2023-04-25 | 34 | MOTION for Order for Stay of Proceedings by JOHN CAMPO, MARY ANNE CAMPO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 04/25/2023) |
2023-04-28 | | MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 34 Plaintiffs' Motion for Stay of Proceedings. Plaintiffs have not established good cause to stay these proceedings. The court does not understand why this FOIA case must be paused to afford Plaintiffs time to acquire the names of witnesses that will be useful to them in an entirely different matter pending in a different court. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/28/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 04/28/2023) |
2023-05-02 | 35 | Joint MOTION to Modify The Court's February 1, 2023 Scheduling Order by UNITED STATES COAST GUARD. (Littman, M.) (Entered: 05/02/2023) |
2023-05-04 | 36 | ORDER granting 35 Motion to Modify. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before June 5, 2023; Plaintiffs' Response and Cross-Motion shall be filed on or before July 5, 2023; Defendant's Reply and Cross-Response shall be filed on or before August 4, 2023; and Plaintiffs' Cross-Reply shall be filed on or before September 4, 2023. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/04/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/04/2023) |
2023-05-19 | 37 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by JOHN CAMPO, MARY ANNE CAMPO. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/19/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |