Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01716
Date Filed2020-06-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning a January 2019 memo prepared for then Chief of Staff Thomas Blank addressing enforcement, zero tolerance, or family separation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-241COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7264162) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons U.S. Att'y General, # 4 Summons DHS, # 5 Summons ICE)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-242LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-24Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-253SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-08-034Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-08-03MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 4 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by August 17, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/3/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-08-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/17/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar