Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01729
Date Filed2020-06-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning requests by former UN Ambassador Samantha Powers to "unmask" the identities of U.S. citizens identified during the investigation of Russian interference in the 2016 election. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Judicial Watch explained that it had made the identical request in 2018 and that in 2019, a district court judge had accepted State's Glomar response. However, Judicial Watch pointed out that in 2020, the Office of the Director of National Intelligence had declassified documents indicating that Powers had made seven requests to unmask Michael Flynn's identity. After hearing nothing further from the agency and based on that change in circumstances, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-241COMPLAINT against JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7265463) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-242LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-243NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Case related to Case No. 18-0300. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-25Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-254SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-07-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/6/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/5/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/06/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-147RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/6/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar