Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEGAL EAGLE, LLC v. NATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01732
Date Filed2020-06-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffLEGAL EAGLE, LLC
Case DescriptionLegal Eagle, which runs a YouTube channel, submitted FOIA requests to the National Security Council Records Access and Information Security Management Directorate, as well as agencies in the intelligence community for records concerning the declassification review for John Bolton's book. Legal Eagle also requested expedited processing. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from any agency, Legal Eagle filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Expedited processing

DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-251COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7266904) filed by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-25Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-252SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-253LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-07-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/6/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/5/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/6/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 7/6/2020; DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 7/6/2020; DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/6/2020; DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/6/2020; NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 7/6/2020; OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 7/9/2020 (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-165AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against All Defendants filed by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC.(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-08-036NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Robert Healy on behalf of All Defendants (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-08-037Partial MOTION to Dismiss NSC-RAISMD by NATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-08-038MOTION to Stay Answer Deadline Due to Partial Motion to Dismiss by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-08-039ERRATA Partial Motion to Dimiss with Proposed Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE 7 Partial MOTION to Dismiss NSC-RAISMD filed by NATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE. (Attachments: # 1 Partial Motion to Dismiss with Proposed Order)(Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-08-03MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Answer Deadline Due to Partial Motion to Dismiss: It is hereby ORDERED that the period for Defendants to respond to 5 Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is hereby STAYED until 14 days after the Court's disposition of 7 Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/3/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-08-1710Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 Partial MOTION to Dismiss NSC-RAISMD by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 08/17/2020)
2020-08-18MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further briefing in this case: Plaintiff shall file its opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before August 24, 2020; Defendants shall file their reply and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion on or before September 8, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/18/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/18/2020)
2020-08-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 8/24/2020. Reply to Cross Motions due by 9/8/2020. Responses due by 8/24/2020. Replies due by 9/8/2020. (tj) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-2211MOTION to Expedite Case by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 08/22/2020)
2020-08-2512Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 Partial MOTION to Dismiss NSC-RAISMD by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-2513MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Request letters, # 2 Exhibit B - Expedited processing denials, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-2614Memorandum in opposition to re 7 Partial MOTION to Dismiss NSC-RAISMD filed by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-08-26MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's 13 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 14 Opposition to Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss are hereby deemed timely filed. Consistent with the Court's earlier Minute Order (Aug. 18, 2020), Defendants shall file their reply and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion on or before September 8, 2020, but file a motion for extension of time if necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/26/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-08-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motions due by 9/8/2020. Replies due by 9/8/2020. (tj) (Entered: 08/27/2020)
2020-09-0815Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION to Expedite Case filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-0816MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs Motoin for Partial Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-0817Memorandum in opposition to re 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs Motoin for Partial Summary Judgment filed by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Counsel's email correspondence, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-0818REPLY to opposition to motion re 7 Partial MOTION to Dismiss NSC-RAISMD filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-08MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their combined cross-motion for partial summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment on or before September 18, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/8/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-0819REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs Motoin for Partial Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion for partial Summary Judgment due by 9/18/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/18/2020. (hs) (Entered: 09/09/2020)
2020-09-1520REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION to Expedite Case filed by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC. (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-1821MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-1822Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (See Docket Entry 21 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-21MINUTE ORDER denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Case: On August 22, 2020--nearly two months after filing its complaint--Plaintiff moved to expedite this case. But before Plaintiff filed its complaint, scores of other litigants filed complaints or motions that have become ready for the Court to rule on. Most of the Court's cases have significant consequences for litigants, and many of them carry the potential to affect the upcoming election too. See, e.g., Protect Democracy Project, Inc. v. U.S. Dep't of Justice, 20-cv-172 (FOIA suit seeking records related to killing of top Iranian military official); Matthews v. Saul, 18-1110 (asserting erroneous denial of Social Security disability benefits); Garcia Ramirez v. U.S. Immigr. & Customs Enf't, No. 18-508 (eighteen-year-old unaccompanied alien children claiming improper detention by ICE); Wildearth Guardians v. Jewell, No. 16-cv-1724 (alleging that federal government fails to consider climate impact when granting oil and gas leases in western United States). These and other cases also have valid claims for the Court's immediate attention, even if not all of their litigants have moved to expedite. The Court will not use the "broad discretion" it enjoys in "deciding case management and scheduling matters" to move Plaintiff's case to the front of the line. See G.Y.J.P. by & through M.R.P.S. v. Wolf, No. 20-01511, 2020 WL 4192490, at *2 (D.D.C. July 21, 2020) (citation omitted). It thus DENIES 11 Plaintiff's motion to expedite the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/21/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-2323NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Knight letter)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-2524RESPONSE re 23 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-2525REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C - McClanahan declaration)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/26/2020)
2020-10-0226REPLY to opposition to motion re 21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-0627MOTION to Strike 21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment , 26 Reply to opposition to Motion, by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 10/06/2020)
2020-10-0828Memorandum in opposition to re 27 MOTION to Strike 21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment , 26 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-0829REPLY to opposition to motion re 27 MOTION to Strike 21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment , 26 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC. (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-2330NOTICE of New Evidence by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC re 13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D - OSD/JS processing notes)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-10-2731RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Notice filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNCIL RECORDS ACCESS AND INFORMATION SECURITY MANAGEMENT DIRECTORATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar