Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. Central Intelligence Agency
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv04868
Date Filed2020-06-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lorna G. Schofield
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffRukmini Callimachi
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Rukmini Callimachi submitted four FOIAA requests to the CIA for records concerning journalist James Foley, who was abducted and executed by ISIS terrorists in Syria. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-251COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20416719)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Rukmini Callimachi..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-252CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-253RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-254REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rukmini Callimachi, The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-255NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandra Perloff-Giles on behalf of Rukmini Callimachi, The New York Times Company..(Perloff-Giles, Alexandra) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-26CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-26Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-26Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-266ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency..(pc) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-07-297ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency..(Barnea, Jean-David) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-08-038ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/3/2020) (cf) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar