Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01741
Date Filed2020-06-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted five FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning communications between senior officials pertaining to the termination of the agency's inspector general, including a number of keyword searches. American Oversight also requested expedited processing for four of the requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-261COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7272812) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to US Attorney's Office, # 3 Summons as to Attorney General, # 4 Summons as to US Department of State)(Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-26Case assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmc) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-263SUMMONS(3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-294STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 29, 2020. (lccjn1) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-07-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/6/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/06/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/6/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/5/2020.) (Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar