Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLatinoJustice PRLDEF v. United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv04859
Date Filed2020-06-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lewis J. Liman
PlaintiffLatinoJustice PRLDEF
Case DescriptionLatinoJustice submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning a proposed rule that would prohibit households containing a mixture of legal and non-documented individuals from receiving federal rental aid. LatinoJustice also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, LatinoJustice filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Opinion/Order [13]
Opinion/Order [17]
Opinion/Order [21]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-241COMPLAINT against United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20405313)Document filed by LatinoJustice PRLDEF. (Attachments: # 1 A - HUD's Proposed Rule, # 2 B - LatinoJustice February 10, 2020 FOIA Request, # 3 C - HUD letter dated February 21, 2020, # 4 D - HUD letter dated March 30, 2020, # 5 E - Email correspondence between LatinoJustice and HUD, # 6 F - HUD interim response, # 7 G - HUD redacted record).(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-242CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-243STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-02283-LJL. Document filed by LatinoJustice PRLDEF..(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-244RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by LatinoJustice PRLDEF..(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-245REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by LatinoJustice PRLDEF..(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-246NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey J. Amato on behalf of LatinoJustice PRLDEF..(Amato, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-247NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerry Donovan on behalf of LatinoJustice PRLDEF..(Donovan, Kerry) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-248NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay Wexler on behalf of LatinoJustice PRLDEF..(Wexler, Jay) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-249NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mohammad Basim Pathan on behalf of LatinoJustice PRLDEF..(Pathan, Mohammad) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-2410NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Lycia Ora Bannan on behalf of LatinoJustice PRLDEF..(Bannan, Natasha) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-25CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pne) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-25Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-25CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis J. Liman as possibly related to 20CV2283. (pne) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-2511ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Housing and Urban Development..(pne) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-2512NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Francisca Fajana on behalf of LatinoJustice PRLDEF..(Fajana, Francisca) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-29CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-02283-LJL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-29NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-29Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (wb) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-2913ORDER: The parties shall appear for a telephonic conference at 4:00 p.m. on July 2, 2020. They are directed to call (888) 251-2909 and use access code 2123101. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 7/2/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 6/29/2020) (va) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-3014NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine Schessler Poscablo on behalf of United States Department of Housing and Urban Development..(Poscablo, Christine) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-06-3015OBJECTION TO STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: 3 Statement of Relatedness and Request for Adjournment of July 2, 2020 Conference . Document filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development..(Poscablo, Christine) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-07-0116RESPONSE re: 15 OBJECTION TO STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS . Document filed by LatinoJustice PRLDEF..(Amato, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-0117ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's objection to the relatedness of this case with The Legal Aid Society v. United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, No. 20-cv2283, and its request to adjourn the telephonic conference set for 4:00 p.m. on July 2, 2020. (Dkt. No. 15.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff file a response to the Government's letter no later than 5:00 p.m. on June 2, 2020. The conference previously set for June 2, 2020 is ADJOURNED sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/1/2020) (va) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-0418ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Christine S. Poscablo dated June 30, 2020 re: letter requesting to adjourn conference. ENDORSEMENT: Having considered the Government's application and Plaintiff's response, the Court affirms its prior conclusion that this case is related to 20-cv-2283 The Legal Aid Society v. United States Department of Housing and Urban Development and the Court's acceptance of the assignment of this case on that basis. The parties in this case shall appear for a telephonic conference on July 8, 2020 at 6:30 p.m. They are directed to call (888) 251-2909 and use access code 2123101.., (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/4/2020) ( Telephone Conference set for 7/8/2020 at 06:30 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (ks) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-0819LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Christine S. Poscablo dated July 8, 2020 re: Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint. Document filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development..(Poscablo, Christine) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-0820NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kirti Vaidya Reddy on behalf of United States Department of Housing and Urban Development..(Reddy, Kirti) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-0821ORDER: The parties in this case shall appear for a telephonic conference at 5:30 p.m. on July 28, 2020. They are directed to call (888) 251-2909 and use access code 2123101. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 05:30 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/8/2020) (va) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-08Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Telephone Conference held on 7/8/2020. Jeffrey Amato, Jeffrey Kessler, Kerry Donovan, Francisca Fajana, Mohammad Pathanand, Jay Wexler, and Natasha Bannan present by telephone for Plaintiff. Christine Poscablo and Kirti Reddy present by telephone for Defendant. Court reporter present by telephone. Next Telephone Conference set for July 28, 2020 at 5:30PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf) (Entered: 07/12/2020)
2020-07-3122ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development..(Reddy, Kirti) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar