Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKnight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University et al v. Department of State et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv04911
Date Filed2020-06-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John G. Koeltl
PlaintiffKnight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union
Case DescriptionThe Knight First Amendment Institute and the American Civil Liberties Union submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State, Department of Justice, CIA, National Security Agency, FBI, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Air Force, Department of Army, and Department of Navy for records concerning the government's prepublication review process. The Knight First Amendment Institute and the ACLU requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. Several agencies denied the requests for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, the Knight First Amendment Center and the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of State
DefendantDepartment of Justice, Office of Information Policy
DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
DefendantNational Security Agency
DefendantFederal Bureau Of Investigation
DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence
DefendantDepartment of The Air Force
DefendantDepartment of the Army
DefendantDepartment Of The Navy
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-261COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Department Of The Navy, Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy, Department of State, Department of The Air Force, Department of the Army, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20439218)Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit Attachment B, # 3 Exhibit Attachment C, # 4 Exhibit Attachment D, # 5 Exhibit Attachment E, # 6 Exhibit Attachment F).(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-262CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-263REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of the Air Force, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-264REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of the Army, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-265REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-266FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) Modified on 6/29/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-267REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of State, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-268REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-269REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of the Navy, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-2610REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Security Agency, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-2611REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-2612RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-2613RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-29CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(jgo) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-29Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (jgo) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-29Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-2914ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency..(jgo) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-2915ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of State..(jgo) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-2916ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of The Air Force..(jgo) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-2917ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of the Army..(jgo) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-2918ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department Of The Navy..(jgo) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-2919ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(jgo) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-2920ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Security Agency..(jgo) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-2921ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(jgo) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-29***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jonathan M. Moses to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF 'To' section does not exactly match as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-2922REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-2923LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Jonathan M. Moses dated June 29, 2020 re: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University et al v. Department of State et al, 1:20-cv-04911 (JGK). Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-3024ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy..(jgo) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-06-3025MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 23 Letter, filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, American Civil Liberties Union. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates the disclosure. The clerk will not work on the case during his clerkship. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/30/2020) (jca) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-07-0926SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Department of The Air Force served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union; Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-0927SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Department of the Army served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union; Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-0928SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Central Intelligence Agency served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union; Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-0929SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union; Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-0930SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Department of State served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union; Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-0931SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Federal Bureau Of Investigation served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union; Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-0932SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Department Of The Navy served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union; Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-0933SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. National Security Agency served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union; Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-0934SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union; Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-0935AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy; Central Intelligence Agency, Litigation Division; Department of the Air Force; Department of the Army; Department of the Navy; National Security Agency; Department of State; Office of the Director of National Intelligence; Federal Bureau of Investigation c/o United States Attorney on 7/1/2020. Service was accepted by Osrick Gordon (Person Designated to Accept Service, SDNY U.S. Attorneys Office). Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Moses, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-2136NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Sheive Normand on behalf of Central Intelligence Agency, Department Of The Navy, Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy, Department of State, Department of The Air Force, Department of the Army, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-08-0237ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department Of The Navy, Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy, Department of State, Department of The Air Force, Department of the Army, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 08/02/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar