Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAdvocates for the West v. Bonneville Power Administration
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2020cv01028
Date Filed2020-06-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge John V. Acosta
PlaintiffAdvocates for the West
Case DescriptionAdvocates for the West submitted two FOIA requests to the Bonneville Power Administration for records concerning the agency's decision to sign an implementation agreement committing to take certain steps to facilitate its entry into the Western Energy Imbalance Market. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after nothing further from the agency, Advocates for the West filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Exemption 4 - Confidential business information, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBonneville Power Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-261Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6901138 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Advocates for the West against Bonneville Power Administration (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons). (Missel, Andrew) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-262Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 10/26/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/23/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 11/23/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sb) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-263Summons Issued Electronically as to Bonneville Power Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-264Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Advocates for the West. (Missel, Andrew) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-07-205Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, 3 upon Bonneville Power Administration served on 6/29/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service and Return Mail Receipts) Filed by Advocates for the West. (Missel, Andrew) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-246Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Bonneville Power Administration. (Keller, Joshua) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-07-247ORDER: Granting consent Motion for Extension of Time 6 . Answer is due by 8/18/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (cw) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-07-248First Amended Complaint . Filed by Advocates for the West against Bonneville Power Administration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Changes from Initial Complaint to Amended Complaint). (Missel, Andrew) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar