Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInformed Consent Action Network v. National Institutes of Health
DistrictDistrict of Arizona
CityPhoenix Division
Case Number2:2020cv01277
Date Filed2020-06-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John J Tuchi
PlaintiffInformed Consent Action Network
Case DescriptionInformed Consent Action Network submitted FOIA requests to the National Institute of Health for records concerning government ownership of any potential COVID-19 vaccine. Informed Consent Action Network also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, ICAN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Institutes of Health
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-291COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18424115 filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-292Corporate Disclosure Statement by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (MYE) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-293SUMMONS Submitted by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (MYE) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-294Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18424115. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-1277-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-295Summons Issued as to National Institutes of Health. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-296NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-297ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/29/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-298ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 29, 2020. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/29/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-07-16Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Elizabeth A Brehm on behalf of Plaintiff Informed Consent Action Network. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar