Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01760
Date Filed2020-06-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the Securities and Exchange Commission for records concerning Donald Haidl, who was deceased, and Entrade, Inc. Judicial Watch noted that the requests were related to previous requests it had submitted in 2008. DOJ acknowledged receipt of the request while Judicial Watch did not receive an acknowledgment from the SEC. After hearing nothing further from either, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-291COMPLAINT against All Defendants (U.S. Department of Justice and U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7279993) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for US Department of Justice, # 5 Summons for US Securities and Exchange Commission)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-292LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-30Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-06-303SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-07-144RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/8/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/7/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/10/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/8/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-147RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION served on 7/7/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-238NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of All Defendants (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar