Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINFANTI v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictWestern District of Pennsylvania
CityPittsburgh
Case Number2:2020cv00972
Date Filed2020-06-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan
PlaintiffANTHONY C. INFANTI
Case DescriptionAnthony Infanti submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning Hristo Ivanov. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency provided some records but told Infanti that other records were contained on a computer disc that could not be converted. Infanti filed an administrative appeal of the decision. The agency denied his appeal. Infanti then complained to the Office of Government Information Services. OGIS told Infanti that the agency refused to change his position. Infanti then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-291COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5721843), filed by ANTHONY C. INFANTI. (Attachments: # 1 Table of contents, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-292Summons Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (sdp) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-07-023AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint Anthony C. Infanti . Dept. of Homeland Security sent by US certified mail to Defendant on 06/30/2020, filed by ANTHONY C. INFANTI. Modified on 7/6/2020 (sdp). (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-13Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. (mao) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-13Judge Nora Barry Fischer added. (mao) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-134ORDER REASSIGNING CASE indicating that the Clerk of Court shall reassign this action to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Judge Nora Barry Fischer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/13/2020. (bdk) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-14Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan added. (mao) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar