Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRYO v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01792
Date Filed2020-07-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffEMILY RYO
Case DescriptionEmily Ryo, a professor of law and sociology at the University of Southern California, submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning naturalization data for 2018 and 2019. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. In response to the 2018 request, the agency told Ryo that it was withholding personal information under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Ryo filed an administrative appeal of that decision. The agency agreed to disclose some data it had previously withheld. The agency denied Ryo's request for a fee waiver for her 2019 request. Ryo filed an administrative appeal of that decision but after hearing nothing further from the agency Ryo filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-011COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7290914) filed by Emily Ryo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons as to U.S. Attorney, # 8 Summons as to U.S. Attorney General, # 9 Summons as to Department of Homeland Security, # 10 Summons as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services)(Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-02Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-022SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-133RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 7/9/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/9/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/10/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/9/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/10/2020. (Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-224NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar