Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01797
Date Filed2020-07-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted five FOIA requests to the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records concerning communications between senior officials and outside parties, including keyword searches. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-021COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7293978) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons US Att'y General, # 4 Summons ODNI)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-022LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-02Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-08-144NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Leon Drezner on behalf of OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-145ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE.(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-14MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by August 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/14/20. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/28/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-286Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-28MINUTE ORDER It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by September 11, 2020, which proposes a timetable for Defendant to complete its searches in this matter and a proposed production schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/28/2020. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-08-317AMENDED COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Summons USAO, # 2 Summons US Att'y General, # 3 Summons ODNI)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-09-018SUMMONS (3) Reissued Electronically as to OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(ztd) Modified event title on 9/2/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-119Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-14STATUS REPORT ORDER In light of 9 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to submit their next Status Report by 11/10/2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/14/2020. (lccrc2) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar