Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleState of New York v. The U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
DistrictNorthern District of New York
CitySyracuse Albany
Case Number1:2020cv00742
Date Filed2020-07-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy
PlaintiffState of New York
Case DescriptionThe State of New York submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning the implementation of Executive Order 13,771, which requires agencies to eliminate two regulations for every one promulgated. New York also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied New York's request for a fee waiver. The agency promised to process the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, New York filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantThe U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-021COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against The U.S. Environmental Protection Agency (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5161467) filed by State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIL Request, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-022G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/23/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-02Notice re: Compliance with General Order #12: Pursuant to General Order #12, counsel is required to file the Notice of Related Case form as a separate document. Refer to the Court's website: www.nynd.uscourts.gov for further instructions. Counsel may access the fillable form using the following link: www.nynd.uscourts.gov/content/general-order-12 (pjh, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-023REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): State of New York is requesting summons(es) be issued as to (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons to US Attorney Civil Process Clerk, # 2 Proposed Summons to US Attorney General)(McGrath, Brendan) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-064Summonses Issued as to The U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Summons for U.S. Attorney, # 2 Summons for U.S. Attorney General)(see) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar