Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFerrara v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictDistrict of New Mexico
CityAlbuquerque
Case Number1:2020cv00650
Date Filed2020-07-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Martha Vazquez
PlaintiffVictoria Ferrara
DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services USCIS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-02Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7194548 re 1 Complaint filed by Victoria Ferrara (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ferrara, Victoria) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-02United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (dr) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-022PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-06Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-166NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Department of Homeland Security (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-167CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Department of Homeland Security voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lucero, Manuel) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-168INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 8/25/2020 at 01:00 PM in Albuquerque before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 8/12/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/6/2020. (smd) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-2910ANSWER to 1 Complaint Requesting FOIA relief by Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Victoria Ferrara.(Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-08-0711PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 08/07/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar