Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting, et al v. U.S. Department of Interior
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv04427
Date Filed2020-07-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting
PlaintiffLance Williams
Case DescriptionLance Williams, a reporter for the Center for Investigative Reporting, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Interior for records concerning meetings held by the agency and California state officials that included David Bernhardt and the Bureau of Land Reclamation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Williams and CIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-021COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against U.S. Department of Interior (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-14650591.). Filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 7/2/2020) Modified on 7/6/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-022Certificate of Interested Entities by The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 7/2/2020) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-023Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 7/2/2020) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-024Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on 1 Complaint, and have been added to this case: Lance Williams. (This is a text-only entry.) (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 7/2/2020) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-065Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/20/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-066Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-067Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Interior. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-078NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel M. Brooke (Brooke, Rachel) (Filed on 7/7/2020) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-07-139CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Center for Investigative Reporting, Lance Williams.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-2710NOTICE of Appearance by Gioconda R. Molinari (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-07-2811CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/11/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-07-2812CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Center for Investigative Reporting, Lance Williams (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-08-0413CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Department of Interior.. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 8/4/2020) (Entered: 08/04/2020)
2020-08-0714STIPULATION to Respond to Complaint filed by U.S. Department of Interior. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)
2020-09-1715ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 9/17/2020) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-1716ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 9/17/2020) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-3017ANSWER to Complaint byU.S. Department of Interior. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-10-0218JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by U.S. Department of Interior. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 10/2/2020) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-0819CLERKS NOTICE RE ZOOM INFORMATION. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 2:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero will be proceeding via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs Zoom Webinar ID: 161 926 0804. Passcode: 050855. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 2:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the c ourt. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-0820STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Management Conference filed by U.S. Department of Interior. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 10/8/2020) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-0821Order, signed 10/8/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 20 Stipulation re: Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2020. Initial Case Management Conference, by Zoom, set for 11/6/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-11-0422CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2020 02:00 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconfere nce are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-0423CLERK'S NOTICE RE: OVERDUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. The parties did not file a joint case management conference statement which was due on 10/30/2020. Parties shall e-file a case management conference statement by Thursday, 11/5/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-0524JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by U.S. Department of Interior. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 11/5/2020) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-0925Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/6/2020. Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2021 02:00 PM in Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . FTR Time: Not Reported. P laintiff Attorney: Diana Baranetsky. Defendant Attorney: Gioconda Molinari. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/9/2020) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2021-01-1526STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: Case Management Conference filed by U.S. Department of Interior. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 1/15/2021) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-1527STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Re: Case Management Conference [Proposed] Order filed by U.S. Department of Interior. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 1/15/2021) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-1928Order, signed 1/19/2021, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 27 Stipulation re: Case Management Conference.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-19Set Deadlines/Hearings: see Order 28 ,. Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted a ccess to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2021 02:00 PM in San Franci sco, - Videoconference Only. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-2929STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE Case Management Conference filed by U.S. Department of Interior. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 1/29/2021) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-02-0130Order, signed 2/1/2021, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 29 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-01Set Deadlines/Hearings: See Order 30 . Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted a ccess to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2021 02:00 PM in San Franc isco, - Videoconference Only. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-1131CLERKS NOTICE CORRECTING DATE AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2021 is re-set for 2/26/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted a ccess to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kl hS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-2232STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Management Conference [Proposed] Order filed by U.S. Department of Interior. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-02-2333Order. Signed as modified on 2/23/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 32 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021) (Entered: 02/23/2021)
2021-02-23Set Deadlines/Hearings: See Order 33 . Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted ac cess to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021) (Entered: 02/23/2021)
2021-03-0534STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Case Management Conference filed by U.S. Department of Interior. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 3/5/2021) Modified on 3/5/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/05/2021)
2021-03-0835Order. Signed as modified on 3/8/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 34 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Status Report due by 4/2/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held by Zoom webinar.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-08Further Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2021 at 2:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero will be held by Zoom video.. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or vid eoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . See Order 35 (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-04-0236STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Stipulation to Set Aside Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order by U.S. Department of Interior. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
2021-04-0537ORDER. Signed 4/5/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Status Report due by 5/10/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Ord er 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar