Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGonzales v. Brown et al
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2020cv01923
Date Filed2020-06-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher
PlaintiffKellie Laurren Gonzales
Case DescriptionKellie Gonzales filed an employment discrimination suit against the U.S. Army pertaining to an incident in which she was stopped by a U.S. Army police officer in Colorado. This is not a FOIA suit.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantNate Brown Army Police Officer
DefendantCooper and Turner, Inc.
DefendantFlorentino Velasquez Chief Army Office
DefendantVestas Tolkhill Mr., Pueblo, CO
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-301Employment Discrimination COMPLAINT against Nate Brown, Cooper and Turner, Inc., Vestas Tolkhill, Florentino Velasquez, filed by Kellie Laurren Gonzales. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Envelope)(trvo, ) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-06-302Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-023ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. That if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this order the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/2/2020. (evana, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar