Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWattleton v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2020cv02752
Date Filed2020-06-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr
PlaintiffDavid Earl Wattleton
Case DescriptionDavid Wattleton, a federal prisoner, submitted a request to the Department of Justice for the psychiatric assessment of him performed during his criminal trial. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Wattleton filed suit. This is a Privacy Act request rather than a FOIA request.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-291COMPLAINT filed by David Earl Wattleton. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-06-293DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR (duplicate filing) COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by David Earl Wattleton. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 7/1/2020 to edit text (jpk). (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-012FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/1/20. (eop) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-01Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to David Earl Wattleton re 2 Order. (eop) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-01Submission of 1 Complaint to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker for IFP review. (jpk) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-02Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to David Earl Wattleton re 2 Order. (kt) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-074ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-designate this action as a non-prisoner case and to terminate the referral to the Magistrate Judge pursuant to Standing Order No. 14-01. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 7/7/2020. (bnp) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-07-07Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (bnp) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-07-07Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to David Earl Wattleton re 4 Order. (bnp) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-07-075ORDER: Plaintiff must, within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the date of the entry date of this order, either submit the full filing and administrative fee of $400.00, or execute and return a financial affidavit seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to forward the appropriate financial affidavit to plaintiff, together with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 7/7/2020. (bnp) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-08Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to David Earl Wattleton re 5 Order and IFP form. (bnp) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-136FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-14Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to David Earl Wattleton RE: 6 Fifth Admin Order. (aaq) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-207APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Earl Wattleton. (bnp) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-21Submission of 5 Order, 7 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (bnp) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-228ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a). However, Service of Process shall not issue at present time and the Clerk shall submit this file to the assigned District Judge for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 7/22/2020. (kt) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-22Submission of 8 Order ruling on IFP. (kt) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-22Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to David Earl Wattleton re 8 Order ruling on IFP, Order that Service of Process shall not issue at present time. (kt) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar