Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUCI Law School Immigrant Rights Clinic v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictCentral District of California
CitySouthern Division - Santa Ana
Case Number8:2020cv01188
Date Filed2020-07-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Josephine L. Staton
PlaintiffUCI Law School Immigrant Rights Clinic
PlaintiffJust Futures Law
Case DescriptionJust Futures Law, a public interest organization advocating for immigrants' rights, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the agency's contract with Palantir for use of its surveillance database. Just Futures Law also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Just Futures Law that its request was too broad. Just Futures Law filed an administrative appeal of that decision and ICE agreed to conduct a search. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the UCI Law School Immigrant Rights Clinic, which represented Just Futures Law, filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-061COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27082865 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff UCI Law School Immigrant Rights Clinic, Just Futures Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G) (Attorney Caitlin Fitzgerald Bellis added to party Just Futures Law(pty:bkmov), Attorney Caitlin Fitzgerald Bellis added to party UCI Law School Immigrant Rights Clinic(pty:bkmov))(Bellis, Caitlin) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-062CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants Just Futures Law, UCI Law School Immigrant Rights Clinic. (Bellis, Caitlin) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-063Corporate Disclosure Both Notice & Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Just Futures Law, UCI Law School Immigrant Rights Clinic, identifying None. (Bellis, Caitlin) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-064Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 filed by Plaintiff Just Futures Law, UCI Law School Immigrant Rights Clinic. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Additional Addresses)(Bellis, Caitlin) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-065NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-066NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-06760 DAY Summons issued re Complaint 1 as to defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (esa) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-068INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-089PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff UCI Law School Immigrant Rights Clinic, Just Futures Law, upon Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 7/7/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Bellis, Caitlin) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar