Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCepeda v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection et al
DistrictSouthern District of Texas
CityMcAllen
Case Number7:2020cv00181
Date Filed2020-07-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Micaela Alvarez
PlaintiffPaola Lorenzo Cepeda
Case DescriptionPaola Cepeda, who had been brought to the U.S. from Mexico when she was three, had lived in the U.S. ever since but was now subject to deportation, submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. All three agencies acknowledged receipt of Cepeda's requests. Her request to CBP asked for records concerning an apprehension in Texas in September 2009 resulting in a voluntary return. CBP disclosed three pages with redactions under Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records) and Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques). Cepeda filed an administrative appeal of the denial and the agency removed some redactions. Her request to ICE asked for records of her detention in Laredo in 2017. The agency provided some records but referred 71 records to USCIS. Her request to USCIS asked for her alien file. The agency located 104 pages and disclosed 27 pages to Cepeda, referring 71 pages to ICE. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Cepeda filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-061COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Paola Lorenzo Cepeda. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-062ORDER PERTAINING TO APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-063ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/15/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-064Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Request for issuance of summons, # 2 Request for issuance of summons)(Joyner, Lauren) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-065CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Paola Lorenzo Cepeda, filed.(Joyner, Lauren) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-066Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-207CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paola Lorenzo Cepeda, filed.(Joyner, Lauren) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-208CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paola Lorenzo Cepeda, filed.(Joyner, Lauren) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-209CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paola Lorenzo Cepeda, filed.(Joyner, Lauren) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-08-0710ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed.(Guerra, David) (Entered: 08/07/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar