Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePowell v. US Department of State
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityDallas
Case Number3:2020cv01789
Date Filed2020-07-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge Sam R Cummings
PlaintiffKellen Powell
Case DescriptionKellen Powell submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning visa approvals and denials by visa category and post from October 2018 to December 11, 2019. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Powell filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Department of State Executive Office, Office of Legal Adviser
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-071New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the national and circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-072Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jmg) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-073COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against US Department of State filed by Kellen Powell. (Filing fee $400.00; Receipt number DS125142) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (jmg) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-074Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Kellen Powell. (jmg) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-085Summons Issued as to US Department of State, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (jmg) Modified text on 7/9/2020 (hml). (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-08***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2, 5 . Wed Jul 8 10:06:11 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-146Request for Clerk to issue Summons (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s), # 2 Additional Page(s)) (Powell, Kellen) Modified docket text on 7/15/2020 (cea). (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-157Summons Reissued as to US Department of State, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (axm) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-228CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kellen Powell (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s)) (Powell, Kellen) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar