Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNEXT GENERATION PET FOOD MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01841
Date Filed2020-07-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffNEXT GENERATION PET FOOD MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION
Case DescriptionThe Next Generation Pet Food Manufacturers Association submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning testing of 1000 pet food samples for bacteria. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told NGPFMA that it would take 16-20 months to process the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NGPFMA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-081COMPLAINT against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7314899) filed by NEXT GENERATION PET FOOD MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons)(Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-082NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of NEXT GENERATION PET FOOD MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-083NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of NEXT GENERATION PET FOOD MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-09Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-094SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-095STANDING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the directives set forth in the Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/9/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-276NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of All Defendants (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar