Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01848
Date Filed2020-07-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffAMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmericans for Prosperity Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications to or from Michael Stuart, the U.S. Attorney for the District of West Virginia, pertaining to a radio ad Stuart ran opposing criminal justice reforms in West Virginia, as well as records about the radio ad. AFPF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. There was some confusion that caused the agency to close and then reopen AFPF's request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AFPF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-091COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7318472) filed by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons Summons for U.S. Department of Justice, # 8 Summons Summons for Civil Process Clerk, # 9 Summons Summons for U.S. Attorney General)(Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-092NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Patrick Mulvey on behalf of AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-093LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-09Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-094STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 9, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-105SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/10/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/9/2020. (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-217RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/15/2020 (Bolinder, Eric) Modified serve date on 7/22/2020 (eg). (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-308NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-08-059RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/15/2020. (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 08/05/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar