Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSIDLEY AUSTIN (DC) LLP v. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01871
Date Filed2020-07-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffSIDLEY AUSTIN (DC) LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Sidley Austin submitted three FOIA requests to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning the agency's proposed rule on Medicare Advantage programs. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency concerning the processing of the requests, Sidley Austin filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-101COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7325109) filed by SIDLEY AUSTIN (DC) LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sean C. Griffin, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Complaint, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Complaint, # 9 Exhibit 6 to Complaint, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Complaint, # 11 Exhibit 8 to Complaint, # 12 Exhibit 9 to Complaint, # 13 Exhibit 10 to Complaint, # 14 Exhibit 11 to Complaint, # 15 Exhibit 12 to Complaint, # 16 Exhibit 13 to Complaint, # 17 Civil Cover Sheet, # 18 Summons 1, # 19 Summons 2, # 20 Summons 3)(Sarraille, William) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-13Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-132SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-303NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-08-034ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Filing Proof of Service by SIDLEY AUSTIN (DC) LLP (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of A. Michaela Kabat, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Sarraille, William); Modified on 8/3/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-08-03NOTICE OF ERROR re 4 Notice (Other); emailed to wsarraille@sidley.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. The correct events can be found under Service of Process. (ztth, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-08-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/20/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/19/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/20/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES served on 7/20/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michaela Kabat, # 2 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipt for US Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Exhibit B - Certified Mail Receipt for US Attorney General, # 4 Exhibit C - Certified Mail Receipt for Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services)(Sarraille, William) (Entered: 08/04/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar