Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCatholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityGreenbelt
Case Number8:2020cv02042
Date Filed2020-07-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Theodore D. Chuang
PlaintiffCatholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.
PlaintiffAlianza Americas
PlaintiffNational TPS Alliance
Case DescriptionThe Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Alianza Americas, and National TPS Alliance submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, the Department of Homeland Security, and the Department of State for records concerning the Trump administration's policy on temporary protected status. The requesters also asked for a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests and granted the requests for a fee waiver. The requesters filed administrative appeals after the agencies failed to respond within the statutory time limit. DHS asked the requesters to narrow the scope of the request. The requesters asked for an explanation of DHS's request to narrow the scope of the request. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, the requesters filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-101COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8749126.), filed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., National TPS Alliance, Alianza Americas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 17 Civil Cover Sheet, # 18 Summons)(Qureshi, Amber) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-10Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 7/17/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-102Summons Issued 60 days as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-103CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/10/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-164Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Alianza Americas (Qureshi, Amber) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-165Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. (Qureshi, Amber) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-166Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by National TPS Alliance (Qureshi, Amber) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-167MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Khaled Alrabe (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8759325.) by Alianza Americas, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., National TPS Alliance(Qureshi, Amber) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-228PAPERLESS ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Khaled Alrabe. Directing attorney Khaled Alrabe to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/22/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-319NOTICE of Appearance by Khaled Alrabe on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Alrabe, Khaled) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar