Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Small Business League v. Small Business Administration
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv04619
Date Filed2020-07-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley
PlaintiffAmerican Small Business League American Small Business League
Case DescriptionThe American Small Business League submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Small Business Administration for records concerning the establishment of advisory committees to oversee the Payroll Protection program. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the American Small Business League filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantSmall Business Administration U.S. Small Business Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-101COMPLAINT against Small Business Administration ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14680125.). Filed byAmerican Small Business League. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/10/2020) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-102Proposed Summons. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/10/2020) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-103Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/10/2020) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-134Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-135Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-136Summons Issued as to Small Business Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Summons USDOJ, Summons USAG Barr)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-147CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Small Business League re 6 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-168AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines ; Civil Standing Order for Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley; ECF Registration Information; and Notice of Assignment of Case and Consent/Decline to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial served on U.S. Small Business Administration on 7/15/2020, filed by American Small Business League. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-169AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines ; Civil Standing Order for Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley; ECF Registration Information; and Notice of Assignment of Case and Consent/Decline to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial served on William P. Barr, U.S. Department of Justice on 7/15/2020, filed by American Small Business League. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-1710NOTICE of Appearance by Irene Lee (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/17/2020) Modified on 7/20/2020 (msrS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/17/2020)
2020-07-1711NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Field (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/17/2020) Modified on 7/20/2020 (msrS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/17/2020)
2020-07-20Electronic filing error . Document not properly linked. [err102]Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 11 Notice of Appearance filed by American Small Business League, 10 Notice of Appearance filed by American Small Business League (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-2412CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Small Business League.. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar